Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Government Employees Insurance Co., Geico Indemnity Co., Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co. v. Altai Corp. d/b/a Get Ready Medical Supply
A Commercial - Insurance case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 31, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 28, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Category
Commercial - Insurance
Practice Area
Insurance
Matter Type
General Insurance
Overview
GEICO alleges that Altai Corp. d/b/a Get Ready Medical Supply failed to meet a
condition precedent to coverage by failing to appear for Examinations Under Oath (“EUOs”).
The EUOs of Altai Corp. d/b/a Get Ready Medical Supply were requested pursuant to
the terms and conditions of the applicable policies of insurance and the No-Fault Regulations.
By failing to appear for EUOs, Altai Corp. d/b/a Get Ready Medical Supply breached
a material condition precedent to coverage under the applicable insurance policies and the No Fault
Regulations. The failure of Altai Corp. d/b/a Get Ready Medical Supply to meet the condition
precedent to coverage vitiates GEICO’s obligation to honor any bills submitted by Altai Corp. d/b/a
Get Ready Medical Supply for reimbursement pursuant to the Insurance Law and the No Fault
Regulation for which EUOs of Altai Corp. d/b/a Get Ready Medical Supply were requested and Altai
Corp. d/b/a Get Ready Medical Supply failed to appear.
As such, Altai Corp. d/b/a Get Ready Medical Supply is not entitled to seek, keep or
receive No-Fault reimbursements from GEICO for all claims in which EUOs of Altai Corp. d/b/a Get
Ready Medical Supply were requested and which Altai Corp. d/b/a Get Ready Medical Supply failed
to appear.
Additionally, GEICO is not obligated to pay reimbursement for any No-Fault related
matters pertaining to the claims in which EUOs of Altai Corp. d/b/a Get Ready Medical Supply were
requested and Altai Corp. d/b/a Get Ready Medical Supply failed to appear.
Causes of Action
ALLEGATIONS COMMON TO ALL CAUSES OF ACTION
1. Against Altai Corp. d/b/a Get Ready Medical Supply (Declaratory Relief Under CPLR §3001)
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint was filed by Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, and GEICO Casualty Co. (collectively "GEICO") against Altai Corp. d/b/a Get Ready Medical Supply. GEICO is seeking a declaratory…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Nov 01, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: Nov 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: Nov 01, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Aug 31, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Secondary Service |
||
November 01, 2023 | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION | ||
November 01, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
August 31, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |