Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Housing Trust Fund Corporation v. Carol Peterka
An Other Matters - Contract - Other case was filed by Housing Trust Fund Corporation, represented by Hepheastou, Sophia, against Carol Peterka, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 31, 2023
Last Refreshed
February 01, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Category
Other Matters - Contract - Other
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Overview
Causes of Action
1. FOR BREACH OF THE REPAYMENT AGREEMENT
2. FOR UNJUST ENRICHMENT
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by the Housing Trust Fund Corporation (HTFC) against Carol Peterka. HTFC is a subsidiary public benefit corporation under the New York State Housing Finance Agency. Carol Peterka is alleged to be the owner of a property lo…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Dec 29, 2023SUMMONS
Date: Aug 31, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: Aug 31, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: Aug 31, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 31, 2023 | SUMMONS | ||
August 31, 2023 | COMPLAINT | ||
August 31, 2023 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) |