Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Green Note Capital Partners Spv Llc v. Recycle Me Mom, Llc D/B/A RECYCLE ME MOM, Adrienne L Mays
An Other Matters - Contract - Other case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 31, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 26, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Category
Other Matters - Contract - Other
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Overview
Causes of Action
1. Breach of Contract
2. Personal Guarantee
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, by Green Note Capital Partners SPV LLC against Recycle Me Mom, LLC d/b/a Recycle Me Mom and Adrienne L Mays. The complaint alleges breach of contract and pe…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: Oct 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A MERCHANT AGREEMENT Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Aug 31, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Aug 31, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2023 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
September 22, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A MERCHANT AGREEMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR MERCHANT AGREEMENT Redacted |
||
August 31, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |