Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Madeline Singas, District Attorney For The County Of Nassau O/B/O LOUIS LIQUORI O/B/O DIANE LIQUORI v. Kevin Brody
On September 13, 2019 an other matters - civil forfeiture case was filed by Madeline Singas, District Attorney For The County Of Nassau O B O Louis Liquori O B O Diane Liquori, represented by Winer, Rebecca Michelle, against Kevin Brody, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 13, 2019
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Filing Court House
Nassau County Supreme Court
Category
Other Matters - Civil Forfeiture
Status
Confession of Judgment
Case Duration
5 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT
Date: Sep 19, 2019JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) Corrected
Date: Sep 17, 2019CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) Corrected
Date: Sep 17, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Sep 13, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) *Corrected* | |
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) *Corrected* | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) |