Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Jenniffer C. Bonilla v. Rachel A. Armendariz
On September 12, 2019 a torts - motor vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 12, 2019
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Filing Court House
Nassau County Supreme Court
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Duration
19 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Oct 01, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: Oct 01, 2019SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 12, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |