Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Karen M. Mullins v. Briana L. Massaro
On September 09, 2019 a torts - motor vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge RANDY SUE presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 09, 2019
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Filing Court House
Nassau County Supreme Court
Judge
Hon. RANDY SUE
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Closed
Case Duration
11 months and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Aug 27, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Aug 27, 2020CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: May 12, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 06, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 09, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Mar 09, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Mar 09, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: Feb 20, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: Jan 15, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: Jan 07, 2020ANSWER
Date: Oct 02, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Oct 02, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 23, 2019SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 09, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for EFI |
|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) stipulation of discontinuance |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | |
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE 306c Notice to Medicaid |
|
May 05, 2020 | hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. (PRE-NOTE) RANDY SUE MARBER ADR/ES CONF 9:30 COMC 05/28/20 Judge: RANDY SUE MARBER |
|
March 17, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED RANDY SUE MARBER ADR/ES CONF 9:30 COMC 05/28/20 Judge: RANDY SUE MARBER |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING statement of authorization |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
February 11, 2020 | hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD RANDY SUE MARBER (PC) Judge: RANDY SUE MARBER |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |