Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Workers' Compensation Board Of The State Of New York v. E&C Jamaican Taste Inc
On January 08, 2013 a workers comp app for judgement case was filed by Workers' Compensation Board Of The State Of New York, represented by Mcginn, James R, against E&C Jamaican Taste Inc, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 08, 2013
Last Refreshed
November 11, 2021
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Filing Court House
Nassau County Supreme Court
Category
Workers Comp App for Judgement
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
Workers Compensation
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: Apr 26, 2013JUDGMENT
Date: Jan 08, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT filed 04-26-13 |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on January 08, 2013 |