Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
The Lcf Group, Inc., v. Asdw Contracting Llc D/B/A ASDW CONTRACTING, Ira Daniel Washington Iii
A Commercial - Contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 01, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 15, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Filing Court House
Supreme
Category
Commercial - Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Settlement
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: Apr 10, 2024BILL OF COSTS
Date: Apr 10, 2024JUDGMENT
Date: Apr 10, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: Apr 10, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Apr 10, 2024STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: Feb 28, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Feb 01, 2024SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: Feb 01, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2024 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
April 10, 2024 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
April 10, 2024 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 10, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
April 10, 2024 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 28, 2024 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
February 01, 2024 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 01, 2024 | SUMMONS WITH NOTICE |