Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Magguy Thomas v. Navah Evans
A Torts - Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 01, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 16, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Filing Court House
Supreme
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Active
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint, filed by Magguy Thomas in the Nassau County Clerk's office on February 1, 2024, alleges that Navah Evans is responsible for a motor vehicle accident that occurred on February 11, 2021, in Nassau County, New York. The plaintiff cla…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 13, 2024PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: May 13, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Mar 20, 2024ANSWER
Date: Mar 20, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 19, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 11, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 08, 2024SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Feb 01, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2024 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
May 13, 2024 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
March 20, 2024 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 20, 2024 | ANSWER | ||
March 19, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Evans per VTL |
||
March 11, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for Navah |
||
March 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Evans |
||
February 01, 2024 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |