Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Anthony Cascino, Lynn Cascino a/k/a Lynn Mangieri, Oceanside Christopher Federal Credit Union, Municipal Credit Union, The United States Of America Acting Through The Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, John Doe, Sa…
On January 23, 2019 a real property - mortgage foreclosure - residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge Fsp-J presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 23, 2019
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Filing Court House
Nassau County Supreme Court
Judge
Hon. Fsp-J
Category
Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Closed
Case Duration
9 months and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER - CANCELLING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: Nov 08, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 01)
Date: Sep 06, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 01)
Date: Sep 06, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 01)
Date: Sep 06, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 23, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL |
|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #01) | |
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - CANCELLING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | |
October 18, 2019 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) MOTION FORECLOSURE PART ODISREV Judge: FORECLOSURE PART |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01) NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE ACTION |
|
September 06, 2019 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE ACTION/CANCEL N.P. (Motion #001) Decided: 10/30/2019CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: FORECLOSURE PART Answer demanded: Yes Judge: FORECLOSURE PART |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #01) Redacted |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #01) ORDER CANCELING LIS PENDENS AND DISCONTINUING ACTION |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #01) AFFIRMATION OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE COMPLIANCE |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION (Motion #01) | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK) | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MERIT | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK) | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Redacted |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS WITH NOTICE |