Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Cadlerock Joint Venture, L.P. v. Merrill I Rosen Cpa, P.C., Merrill I Rosen
On January 02, 2019 an other matters - contract - other case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 02, 2019
Last Refreshed
October 08, 2023
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Filing Court House
Nassau County Supreme Court
Category
Other Matters - Contract - Other
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Duration
28 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 30, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 30, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 29, 2019SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 02, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |