Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
70 No. Main Llc v. The Board Of Assessors And/Or The Assessor Of The Village Of Freeport And The Board Of Assessment Review
A Real Property - Tax Certiorari case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge Nassau Tax presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 05, 2023
Last Refreshed
February 02, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Judge
Hon. Nassau Tax
Category
Real Property - Tax Certiorari
Practice Area
Tax
Matter Type
Assessment Challenge
Status
Active
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal petition filed by 70 NO. MAIN LLC against the Board of Assessors and/or the Assessor of the Village of Freeport and the Board of Assessment Review. The petitioner alleges that they are an aggrieved party with respect to …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: Sep 06, 2023RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS
Date: Sep 06, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: Sep 06, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: Sep 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 06, 2023TAX CERTIORARI PETITION
Date: Sep 05, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2023 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
September 06, 2023 |
RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS Tax Cert 213-414 2122 RJI |
||
September 06, 2023 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY Tax Cert 213-414 2122 NOI |
||
September 06, 2023 |
STIPULATION - OTHER Tax Cert 213-414 2122 202 Stip |
||
September 06, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Tax Cert 213-414 2122 Aff of Serv for NOI&RJI |
||
September 05, 2023 |
TAX CERTIORARI PETITION Tax Cert 213-414 2122 Petition |