Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Cynthia Stalter v. The Assessor Of The County Of Nassau And The Nassau County Assessment Review Commission
A Real Property - Tax Certiorari case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge Nassau Tax presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 31, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 24, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Judge
Hon. Nassau Tax
Category
Real Property - Tax Certiorari
Practice Area
Tax
Matter Type
Assessment Challenge
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a notice of petition filed by Cynthia Stalter against the Assessor of the County of Nassau and the Nassau County Assessment Review Commission. The petitioner, represented by Maidenbaum & Sternberg, LLP, alleges that they are a t…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 07, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: Sep 06, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: Sep 06, 2023RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS
Date: Sep 06, 2023TAX CERTIORARI PETITION
Date: Aug 31, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NOI/RJI AOS 20/21 |
||
September 06, 2023 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY NOI - 20/21 |
||
September 06, 2023 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
September 06, 2023 |
RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS RJI - 20/21 |
||
August 31, 2023 | TAX CERTIORARI PETITION |