Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
World Courier, Inc. v. The Assessor, The Board Of Assessors And The Assessment Review Commission Of The County Of Nassau
A Real Property - Tax Certiorari case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge Nassau Tax presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 16, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 29, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Judge
Hon. Nassau Tax
Category
Real Property - Tax Certiorari
Practice Area
Tax
Matter Type
Assessment Challenge
Status
Settlement
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: Jul 14, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: Jul 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jul 14, 2023TAX CERTIORARI PETITION
Date: Jun 16, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
July 14, 2023 |
RJI -RE: OTHER Settlement |
||
July 14, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 16, 2023 | TAX CERTIORARI PETITION |