Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
H. KLEIN & SONS vs. MINEOLA
A Tax Certiorari case was filed in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge Thomas A. Adams presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 26, 2011
Last Refreshed
September 27, 2021
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Category
TAX CERTIORARI
Practice Area
Tax
Matter Type
Assessment Challenge
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
1 year, 4 months and 12 days
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2013 | hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL VILLAGE TAX PER O/J Judge: THOMAS A. ADAMS |
|
September 19, 2012 | hearing |
ADJOURNED VILLAGE TAX Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
June 12, 2012 | hearing |
ADJOURNED VILLAGE TAX Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
September 26, 2011 | hearing |
ADJOURNED VILLAGE TAX Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |