Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
S & V Realty Partnership v. The Assessor And The Assessment Review Commission Of Nassau County
On January 22, 2019 a real property - tax certiorari case was filed by S & V Realty Partnership, represented by Renda, Robert Luigi, against The Assessor And The Assessment Review Commission Of Nassau County, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge Tax Cert Judge presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 22, 2019
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Filing Court House
Nassau County Supreme Court
Judge
Hon. Tax Cert Judge
Category
Real Property - Tax Certiorari
Practice Area
Tax
Matter Type
Assessment Challenge
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
2 months and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT
Date: Apr 16, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: Jan 28, 2019TAX CERTIORARI PETITION
Date: Jan 22, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
March 26, 2019 | hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT PRE-NOTE TAX CERT CONTROL PART PER O/J Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: OTHER 3961N, tax certiorari |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT 3961N |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) 3961N |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
TAX CERTIORARI PETITION S & V Realty Partnership_1516 Pet_3961N |