Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Wilfred And Co., Llc v. Nassau, County Of
On January 03, 2019 a real property - tax certiorari case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge STEPHEN A. BUCARIA presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 03, 2019
Last Refreshed
October 04, 2023
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Filing Court House
Nassau County Supreme Court
Category
Real Property - Tax Certiorari
Practice Area
Tax
Matter Type
Assessment Challenge
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
1 year, 9 months and 20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT
Date: Nov 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 09, 2020JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: Oct 09, 2020STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: Mar 07, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 07, 2019NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: Mar 07, 2019INCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT
Date: Mar 07, 2019RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS
Date: Mar 07, 2019TAX CERTIORARI PETITION
Date: Jan 03, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2020 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 23, 2020 | hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL CERTIFICATION CONFERENCE PER O/J Judge: STEPHEN A. BUCARIA |
|
October 09, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 09, 2020 | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | ||
October 06, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED CERTIFICATION CONFERENCE Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
July 07, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED CERTIFICATION CONFERENCE Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
March 10, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED TAX CERT CONTROL PART Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
March 05, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED TAX CERT CONTROL PART Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
July 01, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED TAX CERT CONTROL PART Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
April 15, 2019 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD TAX CERT CONTROL STATUS PT Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
March 19, 2019 | hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD TAX CERT CONTROL PC PART Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | INCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS | |
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | TAX CERTIORARI PETITION |