Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
4 Ds Realty Holding Llc, v. Nassau County, The Board Of Assessors And /Or The Assessor Of The County Of Nassau And The Board Of Assessment Review,
On January 02, 2019 a real property - tax certiorari case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge Tax Cert Judge presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 02, 2019
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Filing Court House
Nassau County Supreme Court
Judge
Hon. Tax Cert Judge
Category
Real Property - Tax Certiorari
Practice Area
Tax
Matter Type
Assessment Challenge
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Settlement
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: Apr 01, 2019RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: Apr 01, 2019ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: Apr 01, 2019TAX CERTIORARI PETITION
Date: Jan 02, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2019 | hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT PRE-NOTE TAX CERT CONTROL PART PER O/J Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: OTHER For Settlement Purposes Only |
|
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | |
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | TAX CERTIORARI PETITION |