Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GUTIERREZ, CONSUELO vs. JP MORGAN CHASE BANK
A Comm-Contract case was filed in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge James P. McCormack presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 09, 2019
Last Refreshed
October 13, 2021
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Category
Comm-Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Closed
Case Duration
1 month and 16 days
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2019 | hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) James P\. McCormack Motion Part 9-9-19 TO JPM (Conversion) Judge: McCormack, Hon. James P. |
|
October 25, 2019 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) James P\. McCormack (MTN) 9-9-19 TO JPM Judge: JAMES P. MCCORMACK |
|
October 18, 2019 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) James P\. McCormack Motion Part 9-9-19 TO JPM (Conversion) Judge: McCormack, Hon. James P. |
|
October 18, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) James P\. McCormack (MTN) 9-9-19 TO JPM Judge: JAMES P. MCCORMACK |
|
September 20, 2019 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) James P\. McCormack Motion Part 9-9-19 TO JPM (Conversion) Judge: McCormack, Hon. James P. |
|
September 20, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) James P\. McCormack (MTN) 9-9-19 TO JPM Judge: JAMES P. MCCORMACK |
|
September 09, 2019 | Motion |
Dismiss (Motion #001) Decided: 12/20/2019Closed Before Justice: McCormack, Hon. James P. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: McCormack, Hon. James P. |
|
September 09, 2019 | Motion |
DISMISS COMPLAINT/PETITION (Motion #001) Decided: 12/20/2019CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: James P\. McCormack Answer demanded: Yes Judge: JAMES P. MCCORMACK |