Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STRATEGIC REALTY FUND, LLC vs. MURRAY, ANDREA
A Rp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential case was filed in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY. Judge Status Judge, JFS presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 30, 2019
Last Refreshed
November 16, 2021
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Judge
Hon. Status Judge, JFS
Category
RP-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2020 | hearing |
Not Held Foreclosure Auction Part 14SEARING (Conversion) Judge: Status Judge, JFS |
|
March 17, 2020 | hearing |
FORECLOSURE AUCTION PART 14SEARING Judge: JFS STATUS JUDGE |
|
February 14, 2020 | hearing |
Disposed/Result of a Motion Jfs Status Part Judge: Status Judge, JFS |
|
February 14, 2020 | hearing |
DISPOSED/RESULT OF A MOTION JFS STATUS PART Judge: JFS STATUS JUDGE |
|
December 27, 2019 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 03/05/2019Granted Before Justice: (Foreclosure Part), FP Answer demanded: No Judge: (Foreclosure Part), FP |
|
December 27, 2019 | Motion |
ORDER OF PUBLICATION (Motion #001) Decided: 03/05/2019MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: FORECLOSURE PART Answer demanded: No Judge: FORECLOSURE PART |
|
November 26, 2019 | hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #003) Foreclosure Motion Part JFS (Conversion) Judge: (Foreclosure Part), FP |
|
November 26, 2019 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #003) MOTION FORECLOSURE PART JFS Judge: FORECLOSURE PART |
|
October 29, 2019 | Motion |
Judgment - Foreclosure & Sale (Motion #003) Decided: 12/23/2019Closed Before Justice: (Foreclosure Part), FP Answer demanded: Yes Judge: (Foreclosure Part), FP |
|
October 29, 2019 | Motion |
JUDGEMENT-FORECLOSURE & SALE (Motion #003) Decided: 12/23/2019CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: FORECLOSURE PART Answer demanded: Yes Judge: FORECLOSURE PART |
|
July 30, 2019 | hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #002) Foreclosure Motion Part OREF (Conversion) Judge: (Foreclosure Part), FP |
|
July 30, 2019 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #002) MOTION FORECLOSURE PART OREF Judge: FORECLOSURE PART |
|
July 17, 2019 | Motion |
Order of Reference/Referee to Compute (Motion #002) Decided: 08/15/2019Granted Before Justice: (Foreclosure Part), FP Answer demanded: Yes Judge: (Foreclosure Part), FP |
|
July 17, 2019 | Motion |
ORDER OF REFERENCE (Motion #002) Decided: 08/15/2019MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: FORECLOSURE PART Answer demanded: Yes Judge: FORECLOSURE PART |
|
March 11, 2019 | hearing |
Not Eligible Foreclosure-Sp Settlement Conf Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Part 2, Foreclosure |
|
March 11, 2019 | hearing |
FSC - NOT ELIGIBLE (U) FORECLOSURE-SP SETTLEMENT CONF Judge: FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONF PT |
|
January 30, 2019 | hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #001) Foreclosure Motion Part CHAMBER (Conversion) Judge: (Foreclosure Part), FP |
|
January 30, 2019 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) MOTION FORECLOSURE PART CHAMBER Judge: FORECLOSURE PART |