Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Lexington Avenue Federal Credit Union v. Kevin B Quinn
A Commercial - Contract case was filed by Lexington Avenue Federal Credit Union, represented by Drexler, Mark Andrew, against Kevin B Quinn, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY. Judge John J Ark presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 08, 2008
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
Monroe County, NY
Category
Commercial - Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: Jan 13, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 13, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
January 13, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 12, 2021 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
July 08, 2008 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION |