Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Millstone Funding, Inc. v. Cacak Express Inc, Goran Jelic
A Commercial - Contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 06, 2024
Last Refreshed
March 09, 2024
Filing Location
Monroe County, NY
Category
Commercial - Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Overview
Causes of Action
1. BREACH OF CONTRACT
2. BREACH OF PERSONAL GUARANTEE
3. AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS (ATTORNEY’S FEES)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 08, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Mar 06, 2024SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Mar 06, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Additional Mailing |
||
March 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service - All Defendants |
||
March 06, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR Contract Redacted |
||
March 06, 2024 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |