Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
J.G. WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC vs PRUDENTIAL ASSIGNED SETTLEMENT SERVICES CORP. et al
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY. Judge Daniel J. Doyle presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 29, 2021
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
Monroe County, NY
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER - OTHER
Date: Mar 23, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: Mar 16, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Feb 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Feb 04, 2021PETITION
Date: Jan 29, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Jan 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: Jan 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - F
Date: Jan 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Jan 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Jan 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Jan 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - H
Date: Jan 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - D
Date: Jan 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Jan 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - E
Date: Jan 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - I
Date: Jan 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Jan 29, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: Jan 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - G
Date: Jan 29, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER Decision and Order-Petition |
||
March 16, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Final Order |
||
February 04, 2021 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
February 04, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 29, 2021 | PETITION | ||
January 29, 2021 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
January 29, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
January 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Prior |
||
January 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Payment Schedule |
||
January 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Purchase Contract |
||
January 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C FedEx Confirmation |
||
January 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H Prior |
||
January 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D List of Dependents |
||
January 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Statement of Professional Representation |
||
January 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Disclosure Statement |
||
January 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I Prior |
||
January 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Disclosure Statement |
||
January 29, 2021 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) | ||
January 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G Prior |