Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Lake Beverage Corporation v. Michael J Wood
A Commercial - Business Entity case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 20, 2018
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
Monroe County, NY
Category
Commercial - Business Entity
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
General Commercial
Case Duration
3 months and 10 days
Overview
Causes of Action
FACTS APPLICABLE TO ALL CAUSES OF ACTION:
1. AGAINST DEFENDANT,
2. AGAINST THE DEFENDANT,
A_S A_ND FOR A THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST THE DEFENDANT..
4. AGAINST THE DEFENDANT,
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Jul 20, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Non-Military Service |
||
October 29, 2018 | Affidavit of Fact | ||
October 29, 2018 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 17, 2018 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
August 06, 2018 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 20, 2018 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
July 20, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A personal gurantee contract |