Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Midfirst Bank v. Randy Paul Hollenbeck, And John Doe And Mary Doe, (Said Names Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants, Tenants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or L…
A Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 10, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 11, 2023
Filing Location
Madison County, NY
Category
Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
AFFIRMATION
Date: Mar 10, 2022STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY (PRE-RJI)
Date: Mar 10, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: Mar 10, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: Feb 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Dec 27, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Dec 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Dec 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Dec 27, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: Dec 10, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: Dec 10, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
March 10, 2022 | STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY (PRE-RJI) | ||
March 10, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
February 03, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
January 12, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RANDY |
||
December 27, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANTS |
||
December 27, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 27, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RACHEL MARY DOE #1 TENANT NOTICE |
||
December 27, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RACHEL MARY DOE #1 |
||
December 10, 2021 |
SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL. Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
December 10, 2021 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
December 10, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF MERIT |