Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Citibank, N.A., Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Delaware Trustee For J.P. Morgan Mortgage Trust Jpmmt 2022-3 v. Yosef Feller, Rivka Feller, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, John Doe #1 Through #6, And Jane Doe #1 Through #6, The…
A Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 07, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 24, 2024
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Category
Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Case Complaint Summary
This legal document is a foreclosure action filed by Citibank, N.A., as the Delaware Trustee for J.P. Morgan Mortgage Trust JPMMT 2022-3, against Yosef Feller, Rivka Feller, and other parties. The complaint alleges that the defendants have failed…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Dec 19, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: Dec 07, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: Dec 07, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Dec 07, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Dec 07, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT MAILING |
||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RIVKA FELLER 3215 |
||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE NAME REFUSED SHA JOHN DOE #1 |
||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE NAME REFUSED SHA JOHN DOE #2 MAILING |
||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RIVKA FELLER |
||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE YOSEF FELLER 3215 |
||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE NAME REFUSED SHA JOHN DOE #1 MAILING |
||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JANE DOE NAME REFUSED SHA JANE DOE #1 MAILING |
||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JANE DOE NAME REFUSED SHA JANE DOE #1 |
||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE YOSEF FELLER |
||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE NAME REFUSED SHA JOHN DOE #2 |
||
December 19, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC PVB |
||
December 19, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 07, 2023 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
December 07, 2023 | CERTIFICATE OF MERIT | ||
December 07, 2023 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
December 07, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |