Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Fenix Capital Funding, Llc v. Steadfast Cargo Transport Llc /Dba Steadfast Cargo Transport Llc, Creating A Solution Today (C.A.S.T) Inc, Steadfast Global Logistics Llc, Marcus Ford, Rene Small
A Commercial - Contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 04, 2022
Last Refreshed
July 15, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Category
Commercial - Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT
Date: Dec 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - D
Date: Dec 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - J
Date: Dec 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - G
Date: Dec 07, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: Dec 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - F
Date: Dec 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Dec 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - I
Date: Dec 07, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: Dec 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - K
Date: Dec 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - H
Date: Dec 07, 2022BILL OF COSTS
Date: Dec 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - E
Date: Dec 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: Dec 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A FRPA Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Dec 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Dec 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A FRPA Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Nov 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Nov 04, 2022SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Nov 04, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2022 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on December 08, 2022 | ||
December 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Second notice Business |
||
December 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J Second notice Aff Business |
||
December 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G AOS on Owner 2 |
||
December 07, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
December 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Second notice Owner |
||
December 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C AOS Business |
||
December 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I AOS Aff Business |
||
December 07, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
December 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K Affirmation of Non - Military Service |
||
December 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H Second notice Owner 2 |
||
December 07, 2022 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
December 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E AOS on Owner |
||
December 07, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
December 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A FRPA Redacted per 22 NYCRR FRPA Redacted |
||
December 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Summons and Complaint |
||
November 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A FRPA Redacted per 22 NYCRR FRPA Redacted |
||
November 04, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 04, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |