Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Lillian Chen v. East 14 Reatly Llc, Vila Window Repair Inc.
On November 09, 2018 a torts - other negligence (premises) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County. Judge Debra Silber presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 09, 2018
Last Refreshed
July 28, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Kings County Supreme Court
Category
Torts - Other Negligence (Premises)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Premises Liability
Case Duration
2 years and 12 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion 2)
Date: Mar 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 2)
Date: Mar 02, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 2)
Date: Mar 02, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: Feb 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 1)
Date: Apr 10, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 1)
Date: Mar 13, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 1)
Date: Mar 13, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 1)
Date: Mar 13, 2019REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: Feb 08, 2019REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: Feb 07, 2019DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: Jan 31, 2019ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Jan 31, 2019DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: Jan 22, 2019ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Jan 21, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Dec 05, 2018SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Nov 09, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2020 | hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) PART 9 Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
September 09, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART ADM ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
April 28, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
April 01, 2020 | hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #002) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART STIP E-FILED 3/10/20 (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
April 01, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART ADM ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2) | |
March 03, 2020 | Motion |
Strike Pleadings (Motion #002) Decided: 04/01/2020Withdrawn Before Justice: Central Compliance Part, Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Correspondence to Plt |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) CC Order |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Demands |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Demand for Bill of Particulars |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Answers |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons & Complaint |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #2) | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Plaintiff's Discovery Demands |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
January 14, 2020 | hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial; 2X (Conversion) Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
September 13, 2019 | hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 05/09/2019 |
|
May 09, 2019 | hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
April 11, 2019 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) MOTION PART Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
April 11, 2019 | hearing |
Marked Off (Motion #001) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART NO PC (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) | |
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Plaintiffs D&I |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Response to D&I |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) BP |
|
March 13, 2019 | Motion |
Strike Pleadings (Motion #001) Decided: 04/11/2019Granted Before Justice: Central Compliance Part, Answer demanded: No Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) | |
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Correspondence to Plt |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Combined Discovery Demands |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Demand for Bill of Particulars |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answers |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) | |
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #1) | |
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) | |
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIMS |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Demand for Bill of Particulars and Combined Demands | |
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | |
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | |
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 21, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 21, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | |
January 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |