Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Confidential Lending Llc v. Eckford-Greenpoint Llc, Xi Hui Wu
On March 04, 2019 a commercial division case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County. Judge Lawrence Knipel presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 04, 2019
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Kings County Supreme Court
Category
Commercial Division
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
General Commercial
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2021 | hearing |
Foreclosure Comm 6 - Covid NAD JE (Conversion) Judge: Knipel, Hon. Lawrence S. |
|
November 02, 2020 | hearing |
Continued Foreclosure Comm 6 - Covid Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Knipel, Hon. Lawrence S. |
|
July 01, 2020 | hearing |
Stay (Motion #002) Commercial Motion Term 6 Judge: Knipel, Hon. Lawrence S. |
|
June 03, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) Commercial Motion Term 6 AM/ADM (Conversion) Judge: Knipel, Hon. Lawrence S. |
|
April 01, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) Commercial Motion Term 6 AM/ADM (Conversion) Judge: Knipel, Hon. Lawrence S. |
|
February 19, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) Commercial Motion Term 6 Judge: Knipel, Hon. Lawrence S. |
|
February 14, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Knipel, Hon. Lawrence S. |
|
January 22, 2020 | Motion |
Confirm/Disapprove Award/Report (Motion #002) Before Justice: Knipel, Hon. Lawrence S. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Knipel, Hon. Lawrence S. |
|
July 17, 2019 | hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) COMMERCIAL PART 9 GSF/SON (Conversion) Judge: Vaughan, Hon. David B. |
|
May 22, 2019 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) COMMERCIAL PART 9 Judge: Vaughan, Hon. David B. |
|
March 27, 2019 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) COMMERCIAL PART 9 Judge: Vaughan, Hon. David B. |
|
March 19, 2019 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Vaughan, Hon. David B. |
|
March 04, 2019 | Motion |
Judgment - Summary (Motion #001) Decided: 07/17/2019Granted Before Justice: Vaughan, Hon. David B. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Vaughan, Hon. David B. |