Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Frankie Angrum v. Eduardo Pan, Brenda Nunez
On November 09, 2018 a torts - motor vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County. Judge Wavny Toussaint presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 09, 2018
Last Refreshed
July 14, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Kings County Supreme Court
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
11 months and 26 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Nov 06, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: Apr 16, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: Feb 22, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: Feb 22, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: Feb 14, 2019DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: Jan 15, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: Jan 15, 2019ANSWER
Date: Jan 15, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Nov 30, 2018SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Nov 09, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2019 | hearing |
Settled - Other CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Judge: Toussaint, Hon. Wavny |
|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
July 18, 2019 | hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Toussaint, Hon. Wavny |
|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations |
|
March 07, 2019 | hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Toussaint, Hon. Wavny |
|
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice to Produce |
|
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Combined Demands |
|
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations |
|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Disclosure Demand |
|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |