Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Jocelyne Lahens v. Mekki A. Muyeeb, Danielle Castor
On November 09, 2018 a torts - motor vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 09, 2018
Last Refreshed
July 28, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Kings County Supreme Court
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Duration
8 months and 5 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jul 16, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jul 16, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 31, 2019SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Nov 09, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stip of Discontinuance |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |