Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Kathleen T. Turnbull v. Smartax Service, Inc., Marlene Roper, Gloria Payton
On September 18, 2019 a torts - motor vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County. Judge Kings Djmp presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 18, 2019
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Kings County Supreme Court
Judge
Hon. Kings Djmp
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2021 | hearing |
Default Judgment Conference PT 2X (Conversion) Judge: Montelione, Hon. Richard J. |
|
November 10, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned Default Judgment Conference PT 1X (Conversion) Judge: Montelione, Hon. Richard J. |
|
June 30, 2020 | hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) DEFAULT JUDGMENT PART PM/ADM (Conversion) Judge: Default Judgement Part, |
|
April 14, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) DEFAULT JUDGMENT PART PM/ADM (Conversion) Judge: Default Judgement Part, |
|
February 04, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) DEFAULT JUDGMENT PART F/PAPER (Conversion) Judge: Default Judgement Part, |
|
November 19, 2019 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) DEFAULT JUDGMENT PART Judge: Default Judgement Part, |
|
October 15, 2019 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) MOTION PART Judge: Default Judgement Part, |
|
September 18, 2019 | Motion |
Judgment - Default (Motion #001) Decided: 07/02/2020Granted Before Justice: Montelione, Hon. Richard J. Answer demanded: No Judge: Montelione, Hon. Richard J. |