Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Geronimo J. Flery v. Tim Costigan, Sarah S. Costigan
On November 09, 2018 a torts - motor vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County. Judge Jury Coordinating Part 1 presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 09, 2018
Last Refreshed
October 10, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Kings County Supreme Court
Judge
Hon. Jury Coordinating Part 1
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jan 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion 1)
Date: May 26, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 1)
Date: May 22, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 2)
Date: Mar 13, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 2)
Date: Mar 13, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 06, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 06, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 06, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 06, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: Dec 16, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: Aug 30, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: Aug 02, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: Mar 14, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Dec 21, 2018ANSWER
Date: Dec 21, 2018SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Nov 09, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
February 11, 2021 | hearing |
JURY COORDINATING PART 1 10:00AM (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
December 04, 2020 | hearing |
(Motion #001) Motion Term 84 ADM/ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Wade, Hon. Carolyn E. |
|
November 13, 2020 | hearing |
(Motion #002) Motion Term 84 9:30AM (Conversion) Judge: Wade, Hon. Carolyn E. |
|
October 23, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Term 84 ADM/ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Wade, Hon. Carolyn E. |
|
July 01, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 PRE-TRIAL (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
June 12, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) Motion Term 84 9:30AM (Conversion) Judge: Wade, Hon. Carolyn E. |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Revised Exhibit "A" Physician's Narrative |
|
May 29, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Term 84 9:30AM (Conversion) Judge: Wade, Hon. Carolyn E. |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) | |
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Thresh |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) Color Photographs |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D-I (Motion #1) D:Emergency Room Records/E: Plaintiff's MRI reports/ F: Report generated by Defendants' expert/G: Pl |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-C (Motion #1) A: Narrative-Dr. Stephen Huish 3-6-20/B: Narrative-Dr. Stella Mansukhani/C: Certified Medical Record |
|
May 01, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Term 84 Judge: Wade, Hon. Carolyn E. |
|
April 13, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Wade, Hon. Carolyn E. |
|
March 26, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Wade, Hon. Carolyn E. |
|
March 19, 2020 | Motion |
Judgment - Summary (Motion #002) Before Justice: Wade, Hon. Carolyn E. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Wade, Hon. Carolyn E. |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-H (Motion #2) A:Summons and Verified Complaint/B:Verified Answer/C:Plaintiff's Veri Bill of Particular/D:Depositio |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) | |
February 07, 2020 | Motion |
Judgment - Summary (Motion #001) Before Justice: Wade, Hon. Carolyn E. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Wade, Hon. Carolyn E. |
|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1) | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Dr. Mannor's Independent Orthopedic Examination Report |
|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Transcript |
|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Verified Bill of Particulars |
|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Note of Issue |
|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Verified Answer |
|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint |
|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #1) Memorandum of Law |
|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support |
|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Order with NOE |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER dated 12/11/2019 |
|
December 11, 2019 | hearing |
Held NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Wade, Hon. Carolyn E. |
|
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER dtd 7/25/19 nsp. |
|
July 25, 2019 | hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Wade, Hon. Carolyn E. |
|
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE dtd 4/11/19 nsp. |
|
April 11, 2019 | hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Trial; STIP TO RESTORE (Conversion) Judge: Wade, Hon. Carolyn E. |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation to Restore Case for Missing Preliminary Conference, First Time On |
|
February 22, 2019 | hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) INTAKE PART DISM/NAP (Conversion) Judge: Wade, Hon. Carolyn E. |
|
January 19, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
January 19, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 19, 2019 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Upon Sarah S Costigan |
|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Upon Tim Costigan |
|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |