Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In The Matter Of The Claim On Behalf Of Wilfredo Cabrera, v. The City Of New York, New York City Department Of Education, New York City School Construction Authority
On November 06, 2018 a torts - other (labor law) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County. Judge Dawn M. Jimenez Salta, Pt 20 presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 06, 2018
Last Refreshed
July 28, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Kings County Supreme Court
Judge
Hon. Dawn M. Jimenez Salta, Pt 20
Category
Torts - Other (LABOR LAW)
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
General Labor
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Closed
Case Duration
2 months and 24 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 07, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: Jan 29, 2019ORDER - OTHER (Motion 1)
Date: Jan 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: Dec 13, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Nov 26, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: Nov 12, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: Nov 12, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: Nov 12, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion 1)
Date: Nov 09, 2018PETITION Corrected
Date: Nov 07, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: Nov 06, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: Nov 06, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) dtd 1/30/19 |
|
January 30, 2019 | hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 88 GSF, CITY HAS PRIV. ATTY. (Conversion) Judge: Jimenez Salta, Hon. Dawn M. |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Verified Answer Index No. 522690/2018 |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A SCA Incident Notification |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | |
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Dated 12/14/2018 |
|
December 14, 2018 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 20 SFO - INS. TAKEOVER, CITY HAS PRIV. ATTY. (Conversion) Judge: Levine, Hon. Katherine A. |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE service upon The City of New York |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE service upon New York City Department of Education |
|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE service upon New York City School Construction Authority |
|
November 12, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | |
November 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Notification |
|
November 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Claimant's affidavit |
|
November 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Incident Report |
|
November 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Served Notices of Claim |
|
November 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Affirmation in Support |
|
November 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Affirmation of Emergency | |
November 09, 2018 | Motion |
Leave to File (Motion #001) Decided: 01/30/2019Closed Before Justice: Jimenez Salta, Hon. Dawn M. Answer demanded: No Judge: Jimenez Salta, Hon. Dawn M. |
|
November 09, 2018 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PART Judge: Levine, Hon. Katherine A. |
|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #1) MS #1 |
|
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE New Affirmation of Notification to the Emergency OTSC |
|
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | PETITION *Corrected* | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: OTHER FILE LATE NOTICE OF CLAIM |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIRMATION OF NOTIFICATION |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT CLAIMANT'S AFFIDAVIT |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B INCIDENT REPORT |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A SERVED NOTICE OF CLAIM |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION OF EMERGENCY |