Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Green Capital Funding, Llc v. A & M Wireless Inc d/b/a A & M Wireless, Ali Qureshi
A Commercial - Contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 06, 2018
Last Refreshed
October 15, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Category
Commercial - Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Confession of Judgment
Case Duration
1 day
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT
Date: Nov 07, 2018JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED)
Date: Nov 06, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: Nov 06, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2018 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Entry of Judgment |
||
November 07, 2018 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 06, 2018 |
JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION |
||
November 06, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A - Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR Ex. A - Agreement Redacted |
||
November 06, 2018 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit In Support |
||
November 06, 2018 |
CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) Confession of Judgment Redacted per 22 NYCRR Confession of Judgment Redacted |