Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Kalamata Capital Group v. Ivprogram Llc, Logistic Alliance Inc, Francisco Javier Borrero
On November 06, 2018 an other matters - contract - other case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 06, 2018
Last Refreshed
July 28, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Kings County Supreme Court
Category
Other Matters - Contract - Other
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Confession of Judgment
Case Duration
1 day
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: Jul 02, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: Nov 07, 2018CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT)
Date: Nov 06, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: Nov 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - A Merchant Agreement Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Nov 06, 2018JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED)
Date: Nov 06, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2020 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Merchant Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR Merchant Agreement Redacted |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) |