Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ana Vallecillo v. Malekeie K. Syfrett, Mario J. Gilles
A Torts - Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 09, 2020
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
AFFIDAVIT
Date: Mar 11, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Dec 03, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Dec 03, 2020ANSWER
Date: Dec 03, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Nov 30, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Nov 30, 2020SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Nov 09, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Out of state service confirmation |
||
December 03, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 03, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 03, 2020 |
ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM, BILL OF PARTICULARS & COMBINED DEMANDS |
||
November 30, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 30, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 09, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |