Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Jomaury Tavares v. The City Of New York, Brooklyn Navy Yard Development Corporation, Bny Tower Associates Llc, Boston Properties, Inc., Rudin Development Llc, Rudin Management Co. Inc., Gilbane Building Company
On October 02, 2018 a torts - other (labor law) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County. Judge Paul Wooten presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
July 28, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Kings County Supreme Court
Category
Torts - Other (Labor Law)
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
General Labor
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Closed
Case Duration
1 year and 30 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Oct 30, 2019ANSWER
Date: Nov 14, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Oct 15, 2018SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Oct 02, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2019 | hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) PART 97 STIP OF DISC FILED, 10/30/19 (Conversion) Judge: Wooten, Hon. Paul |
|
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
July 31, 2019 | hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Wooten, Hon. Paul |
|
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
March 18, 2019 | hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Wooten, Hon. Paul |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Redacted |
|
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | |
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Defendants' Verified Answer with Demands |
|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT of mailing |
|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Of mailing |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT of mailing |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |