Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Igor Gurevich v. David Gallardo, George Gallardo
On October 02, 2018 a torts - motor vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
October 12, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Kings County Supreme Court
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Duration
9 months and 28 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jul 31, 2019ANSWER Corrected
Date: Feb 01, 2019SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Oct 02, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER *Corrected* | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Defendant George Gallardo |
|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Defendant David Gallardo |
|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT |