Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Sharrise Andrews v. Zaida Lopez, Jonathan Rosso
On October 02, 2018 a torts - motor vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County. Judge Landicino presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
July 24, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Kings County Supreme Court
Judge
Hon. Landicino
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jul 29, 2021NOTICE
Date: Apr 13, 2021NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: Dec 11, 2020NOTICE
Date: Jul 30, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 2) Corrected
Date: Mar 09, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: Mar 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 2)
Date: Mar 09, 2020ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: Dec 19, 2019AFFIRMATION
Date: Oct 31, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion 1)
Date: Oct 11, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 1)
Date: Oct 07, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 1)
Date: Oct 07, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 1)
Date: Oct 07, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion 1)
Date: Aug 07, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion 1)
Date: Jul 30, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: Jul 30, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: Jul 30, 2019ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: Jun 24, 2019BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: Jun 03, 2019PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: Jun 03, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 1)
Date: May 29, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 1)
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 1)
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 1)
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - d (Motion 1)
Date: May 29, 2019ANSWER
Date: Feb 21, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Dec 07, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Oct 17, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 17, 2018SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Oct 02, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 13, 2021 |
NOTICE General Motion Notice |
||
February 10, 2021 | hearing |
(Motion #002) Motion Part 81 ADMINISTRATIVE Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
December 11, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Re: Kings County Supreme Civil Court Mediation Program |
||
December 09, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) Motion Term 81 ADMIN (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
October 07, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) Motion Term 81 ADMIN (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
August 05, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) Motion Term 81 Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
July 30, 2020 |
NOTICE General Motion Notice |
||
July 23, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) Motion Term 81 Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
May 18, 2020 | hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
April 15, 2020 | hearing |
Not Called (Calendar) (Motion #002) Motion Term 81 Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
March 31, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
March 31, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART 2X (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
March 13, 2020 | Motion |
Consolidate (Motion #002) Before Justice: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) *Corrected* Deleted the second index number as requested |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exh A - S&C & Answers to both actions |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
December 16, 2019 | hearing |
Continued CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
November 20, 2019 | hearing |
Marked Off (Motion #001) Motion Term 81 SOS (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION REPLY AFFIRMATION |
|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #1) dtd 10/9/19 |
|
October 09, 2019 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Term 81 SOS (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Opposition |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) PC Order |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Affidavit of Russo |
|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #1) dated 7/31/19 |
|
July 31, 2019 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Term 81 SOS (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected* |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR: | |
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | |
June 26, 2019 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
June 21, 2019 | hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | BILL OF PARTICULARS | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | |
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of MTN w Affirmation in Support |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | |
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) S&C |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Def. Answer |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Police Report |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - d (Motion #1) Plt's Affidavit |
|
May 29, 2019 | Motion |
Judgment - Summary (Motion #001) Decided: 11/20/2019Granted Before Justice: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |