Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ronnie King v. The Roman Catholic Diocese Of Brooklyn, Our Lady Of Victory Church, Saint Martin De Porres Parish
A Torts - Child Victims Act case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County. Judge Alexander M. Tisch presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 12, 2021
Last Refreshed
December 05, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
George J. Silver;Category
Torts - Child Victims Act
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
This complaint is filed pursuant to the Child Victims Act (CVA), CPLR 214-g, and
22 NYCRR 202.72, because it pertains to intentional or negligent acts or omissions by a person
for physical, psychological, or other injuries suffered as a result of child sexual abuse.
In approximately 1974, Plaintiff Ronnie King was a minor parishioner at Defendant
Our Lady of Victory Church within Defendant Saint Martin De Porres Parish, in Kings County,
New York. A priest routinely abused the power of his position and repeatedly sexually abused Mr.
King.
The emotional and psychological trauma associated with his sexual abuse has
haunted Mr. King for his entire life. He has been and remains confused, traumatized, and ashamed
Causes of Action
1. NEGLIGENCE AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS
2. NEGLIGENT HIRING, RETENTION, SUPERVISION, AND/OR DIRECTION AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Nov 26, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: Apr 17, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: Mar 19, 2023STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Sep 09, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: Aug 01, 2022ORDER - AMENDED
Date: Jul 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 2)
Date: Jun 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 2)
Date: Jun 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 2)
Date: Jun 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 2)
Date: Jun 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 2)
Date: Jun 30, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 2)
Date: Jun 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 2)
Date: Jun 30, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion 2)
Date: Jun 30, 2022STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Apr 18, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Apr 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 1)
Date: Mar 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 1)
Date: Mar 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 1)
Date: Mar 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 1)
Date: Mar 23, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 1)
Date: Mar 23, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion 1)
Date: Mar 23, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Mar 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 1)
Date: Mar 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S)
Date: Aug 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S)
Date: Aug 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jun 24, 2021ANSWER
Date: Jun 23, 2021CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: Jun 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jun 23, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: Jun 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Apr 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Apr 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Apr 21, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: Apr 16, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: Apr 16, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: Apr 16, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: Apr 16, 2021ORDER - AMENDED
Date: Apr 16, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: Apr 16, 2021SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Apr 12, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Liquidation and Injunction Order |
||
April 17, 2023 |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) First Compliance Conference Stipulation and Order |
||
March 19, 2023 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Compliance Conference Order Timeline |
||
September 09, 2022 | STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
August 01, 2022 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
July 10, 2022 |
ORDER - AMENDED Second Amended Confidentiality Order July 6, 2022. |
||
June 30, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service |
||
June 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Exhibit D - Good Faith Letters |
||
June 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Discovery Demands to Defendant Diocese of Brooklyn Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Discovery Demands to Defendant Diocese of Brooklyn Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
June 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Exhibit B - Answer of Diocese of Brooklyn |
||
June 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint |
||
June 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Exhibit E - Stipulation to Withdraw Motion to Compel |
||
June 30, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Notice of Motion To Enforce Stipulation /Strike Defendant's Answer |
||
June 30, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support |
||
June 30, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #2) Affirmation of Good Faith |
||
April 18, 2022 | STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
April 18, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 23, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C - Disclosure Demands |
||
March 23, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B - Answers |
||
March 23, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A- Summons and Complaint |
||
March 23, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Exhibit D - Good Faith Letters |
||
March 23, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion |
||
March 23, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #1) Affirmation of Good Faith |
||
March 23, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
March 23, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support |
||
August 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit D to CMO #2 Hon. George J\. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Plaintiffs) |
||
August 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit E to CMO #2 Hon. George J\. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Defendants) |
||
June 24, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
June 23, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
June 23, 2021 | CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) | ||
June 23, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 23, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Deposition |
||
April 26, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on Defendant The Roman Catholic Diocese of Brooklyn |
||
April 21, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on Defendant Our Lady of Victory Church |
||
April 21, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on Defendant Saint Martin De Porres Parish |
||
April 16, 2021 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE Hon. George J\. Silver (Directing Master Index Number) |
||
April 16, 2021 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CMO #2 Hon. George J\. Silver |
||
April 16, 2021 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE Order Concerning Liaison Counsel for NYC - Hon. George J\. Silver |
||
April 16, 2021 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Hon. George J\. Silver |
||
April 16, 2021 |
ORDER - AMENDED CMO #2 Hon. George J\. Silver |
||
April 16, 2021 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CMO #1 Hon. George J\. Silver |
||
April 12, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |