Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ann Sojak v. S. Gabichvadze, Mriya, Inc.
On December 30, 2013 a tort case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County. Judge Kurtz, Jcp presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 30, 2013
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Kings County Supreme Court
Judge
Hon. Kurtz, Jcp
Category
Tort
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
2 years, 5 months and 20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jun 20, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jun 20, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 27, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 27, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: Dec 09, 2015DEMAND FOR:
Date: Nov 18, 2015ANSWER
Date: Nov 18, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: Nov 17, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 1)
Date: Nov 02, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion 1)
Date: Oct 22, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 1)
Date: Oct 22, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 2)
Date: Sep 16, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 2) Corrected
Date: Aug 31, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion 2)
Date: Aug 26, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 2)
Date: Aug 26, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Aug 24, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 1)
Date: Aug 18, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 1)
Date: Aug 18, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jun 15, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jul 15, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 13, 2014ANSWER
Date: May 13, 2014SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Dec 30, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
February 25, 2016 | hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #003) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
February 25, 2016 | hearing |
Settled JURY COORDINATING PART 1 2SEL/SP (Conversion) Judge: Kurtz, Hon. Donald Scott |
|
February 04, 2016 | hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 PTC/SPREF (Conversion) Judge: Edwards, Hon. Genine D. |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3) | |
January 27, 2016 | Motion |
Preclude (Motion #003) Decided: 02/25/2016Withdrawn Before Justice: Central Compliance Part, Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) Good Faith Letters |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Verified Answer |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Summons Complaint |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #3) | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) | |
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER dtd 11/13/15 filed cc 11/24/15 (reply attached) |
|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR: | |
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER dated 9/28/15 filed CC 10/27/15 |
|
November 13, 2015 | hearing |
Granted (Motion #001) Motion Term 80 SFO (Conversion) Judge: Edwards, Hon. Genine D. |
|
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) | |
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Copy of New York State I.D. and Benefit Card |
|
October 23, 2015 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Term 80 Judge: Edwards, Hon. Genine D. |
|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1) | |
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) D&I AND LETTER |
|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) | |
September 30, 2015 | hearing |
Remand CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Judge: Edwards, Hon. Genine D. |
|
September 28, 2015 | hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART GEXT (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) | |
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Copy of Motion for a Preferenace |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Copy of Supplemental Response to Discovery Demands |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Copt of Supplemental Response to Discovery Demands |
|
September 03, 2015 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Edwards, Hon. Genine D. |
|
September 01, 2015 | Motion |
Vacate/Strike - Note of Issue/Jury Demand/From Trial Calendar (Motion #002) Decided: 09/28/2015Granted Before Justice: Central Compliance Part, Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) *Corrected* TO VACATE NOTE OF ISSUE |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2) | |
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) | |
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) FOLLOW-UP LETTER AND D&I |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) | |
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) EBT TRANSCRIPT |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) NOTE OF ISSUE |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) | |
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) ANSWER |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) SUMMONS & COMPLAINT |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) | |
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #2) | |
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID) | |
August 19, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | |
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) FOR A PREFERENCE |
|
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) | |
August 18, 2015 | Motion |
Preference (Motion #001) Decided: 11/13/2015Granted Before Justice: Edwards, Hon. Genine D. Answer demanded: No Judge: Edwards, Hon. Genine D. |
|
July 14, 2015 | hearing |
Adjourned CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Judge: Edwards, Hon. Genine D. |
|
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT | |
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE dated 12/12/14 filed CC 12/16/14 |
|
December 12, 2014 | hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected* | |
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT JOSEPH GIARAMITA |
|
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT | |
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |