Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Tamara Wolf v. Ju Young Lee, Hill Country Llc Individually And D/B/A Hill Country Barbecue Market, Hill Country New York Llc, Individually And D/B/A Hill Country Barbecue Market
On December 30, 2013 a tort case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County. Judge Edgar G presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 30, 2013
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Kings County Supreme Court
Judge
Hon. Edgar G
Category
Tort
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
2 years and 27 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Sep 18, 2015STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion 1)
Date: Jul 24, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 1)
Date: Jun 30, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: Jul 17, 2014ANSWER
Date: Apr 07, 2014STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: Feb 10, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 31, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 23, 2014SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Dec 30, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2016 | hearing |
Settled JURY COORDINATING PART 1 PRE-TRI (Conversion) Judge: Kurtz, Hon. Donald Scott |
|
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
July 28, 2015 | hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #001) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Stipulation withdrawing defendants' motion |
|
July 09, 2015 | hearing |
Remand CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Judge: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Vacating Note of Issue. |
|
June 30, 2015 | Motion |
Vacate/Strike - Note of Issue/Jury Demand/From Trial Calendar (Motion #001) Decided: 07/28/2015Withdrawn Before Justice: Central Compliance Part, Answer demanded: No Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Note of Issue |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Bill of Particulars |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Verified Answer to Complaint |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint |
|
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Affirmation of Compliance | |
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue and Certificate of Readiness |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE dated 12/4/14 filed CC 12/10/14 |
|
December 04, 2014 | hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. |
|
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Aff of service of RJI and Req for PC |
|
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for PC |
|
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI for Request for PC |
|
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stip of Discontinuance for Hill Country only |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER STIP OF DISCONTINUANCE AS TO DEFENDANT HILL COUNTRY LLC ONLY |
|
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |