Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Lisa Frazier v. New York City Health & Hospitals Corporation, Alter Kidd M.D., Kim Hyeran N.P.
On December 20, 2013 a medical malpractice case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County. Judge Weston,Med Mal Early Sett Part presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 20, 2013
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Kings County Supreme Court
Judge
Hon. Weston,Med Mal Early Sett Part
Category
Medical Malpractice
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Malpractice
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
2 years, 2 months and 6 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER - OTHER
Date: Feb 25, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 4)
Date: Jan 07, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: Sep 28, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: Apr 10, 2015NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: Apr 10, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: Nov 04, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: Aug 13, 2014DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Feb 11, 2014ANSWER
Date: Jan 29, 2014DEMAND FOR:
Date: Jan 29, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Jan 03, 2014SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Dec 20, 2013RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 20, 2013NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Dec 20, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER dated 1/29/16 |
|
January 29, 2016 | hearing |
Decided (Motion #004) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART EXT (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4) | |
January 07, 2016 | Motion |
Strike Pleadings (Motion #004) Decided: 01/29/2016Closed Before Justice: Central Compliance Part, Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #4) Defts Notice of Entry - 10.21.15 |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #4) Pltf Notice of Entry - 6.2.15 |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #4) Order relieving pltf attorney |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #4) Pltf OTSC and Defts Affirmation in Partial Opp |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #4) Good faith letters |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #4) Statement on Record |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #4) Order dated 2.7.14 |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Answer and Demands |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Summons and Complaint |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Notice of Claim, Demand for Statutory Hearing |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J Defts Notice of Entry - 10.21.15 |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I Pltf Notice of Entry - 6.2.15 |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H Order relieving pltf attorney |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G Pltf OTSC and Defts Affirmation in Partial Opp |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Good faith letters |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Statement on Record |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Order dated 2.7.14 |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Answer and Demands |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Summons and Complaint |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Claim, Demand for Statutory Hearing |
|
October 26, 2015 | hearing |
Disposed/Result of a Motion MED MAL EARLY SETTLEMENT PART 5 Judge: Weston, Hon. Michelle |
|
October 23, 2015 | hearing |
Adjourned MED MAL EARLY SETTLEMENT PART 5 11:00 (Conversion) Judge: Weston, Hon. Michelle |
|
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
October 19, 2015 | hearing |
Adjourned MED MAL EARLY SETTLEMENT PART 5 ON FOR A P.C. (Conversion) Judge: Weston, Hon. Michelle |
|
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER dtd 5/28/15 |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Order for Relief as Counsel |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER Notice of Settlement of Order |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
March 27, 2015 | hearing |
Adjourned MED MAL EARLY SETTLEMENT PART 5 9:30 (Conversion) Judge: Weston, Hon. Michelle |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | |
November 07, 2014 | hearing |
Granted (Motion #003) Mm Early Sett Motn3-Steinhardt GSON (Conversion) Judge: Steinhardt, Hon. Marsha |
|
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | |
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Discovery Follow-UP Request Correspondence |
|
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Demands |
|
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Answers |
|
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Demand for 50-h Hearing |
|
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Claim and Summons and Complaint |
|
October 05, 2014 | Motion |
Attorney - Disqualify/Relieve/Substitute/Withdraw (Motion #003) Decided: 11/07/2014Granted Before Justice: Steinhardt, Hon. Marsha Answer demanded: No Judge: Steinhardt, Hon. Marsha |
|
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | |
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) Order Mots Seq #1 & #2 |
|
February 07, 2014 | hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Mm Early Sett PT 2, Motn-Pfau SFO (Conversion) Judge: Pfau, Hon. Ann |
|
February 07, 2014 | hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Mm Early Sett PT 2, Motn-Pfau GEXT/SF (Conversion) Judge: Pfau, Hon. Ann |
|
January 31, 2014 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) MOTION PART Judge: Pfau, Hon. Ann |
|
January 31, 2014 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Pfau, Hon. Ann |
|
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR: | |
January 15, 2014 | Motion |
Compel (Motion #002) Decided: 02/07/2014Granted Before Justice: Pfau, Hon. Ann Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Pfau, Hon. Ann |
|
January 14, 2014 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 02/07/2014Granted Before Justice: Pfau, Hon. Ann Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Pfau, Hon. Ann |
|
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) | |
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) | |
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) | |
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) | |
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) | |
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Compliant |
|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) |