Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
New York Methodist Hospital v. Clare Heary Individually and as parent(s) and/or legal guardian(s) of child Fiona Heary-Puleo
On December 20, 2013 a contract (non-commercial) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County. Judge Francois A. Rivera (Pt. 52) presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 20, 2013
Last Refreshed
July 21, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Kings County Supreme Court
Judge
Hon. Francois A. Rivera (Pt. 52)
Category
Contract (Non-Commercial)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
6 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT
Date: Jun 25, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Apr 11, 2014SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Dec 20, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2015 | hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 52 SFO (Conversion) Judge: Rivera, Hon. Francois A. |
|
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Statements and itemized bill |
|
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Default Judgment |
|
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Original summons, complaint and affidavit of service |
|
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION Opposition to defendant's order to show cause |
|
January 30, 2015 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 52 Judge: Rivera, Hon. Francois A. |
|
January 06, 2015 | Motion |
Vacate - Decision/Order/Judgment/Award (Motion #001) Decided: 02/27/2015Closed Before Justice: Rivera, Hon. Francois A. Answer demanded: No Judge: Rivera, Hon. Francois A. |
|
January 06, 2015 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PART Judge: Rivera, Hon. Francois A. |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE NON-CONSENT TO EFILE |
|
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default | |
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event | affidavit of investigator | |
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event | affirmation of mailing | |
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event | affidavit of facts | |
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |