Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
John Bonaguro v. The City Of New York, Department Of Environmental Protection, The New York City Department Of Sanitation
On December 10, 2013 a tort case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County. Judge Mark I. Partnow (Pt. 43) presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 10, 2013
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Kings County Supreme Court
Judge
Hon. Mark I. Partnow (Pt. 43)
Category
Tort
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
4 years, 1 month and 2 days
Overview
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT
Date: Jan 10, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: Dec 12, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: Apr 07, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 1)
Date: Jun 21, 2016NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: Jan 11, 2016RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: Mar 25, 2014RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: Mar 25, 2014DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: Mar 25, 2014DEMAND FOR:
Date: Mar 25, 2014SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Dec 10, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT Notice of Settlement of Judgment, Judgment and Waiver of costs and disbursements |
|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service via electronic filing |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry |
|
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER dtd 12/1/17 |
|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER dated 4/5/17 |
|
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of service |
|
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #2) Combined affirmation in opposition to plaintiff's cross motion and reply affirmation |
|
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #2) *CORRECTED INDEX NUMBER* |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2) | |
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) P'S AFF IN OPP TO MTN TO DISMISS |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #1) Exhibit L - Affidavit of Claude Oriol |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #1) Exhibit K - Eric Lehan's deposition transcript |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) Exhibit J - part 5 of 5 |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) Exhibit J - part 4 of 5 part 2 |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) Exhibit J - part 4 of 5 part 1 |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) Exhibit J part 3 of 5 |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) Exhibit J part 2 of 5 part 2 |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) Exhibit J part 2 of 5 part 1 |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) Exhibit J - part 1 of 5 - All discovery responses submitted by Defendants |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) Exhibit I - Notice of Discovery and Inspection |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) Justice King's Order |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Exhibit G - Order to Show Cause |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Exhibit F - Decision and Order |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Exhibit E - Paper submitted in support of and in opposition to the appeal |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Exhibit D - Defendants' Answer |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C - Summons and Complaint |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B - Decision and Order |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) *Corrected* Exhibit A - All papers submitted in support of motion in opposition |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion |
|
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 1/21/15 filed CC 1/23/15 |
|
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE order dated 6/9/14 filed CC 6/10/14 |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND TT'S RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR 3017 |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND TT'S RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR 3101(D) |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS TT'S DEMAND FOR A VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS AS TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: TT'S COMBINED DEMAND FOR D&I |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | BILL OF PARTICULARS | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST REQ FOR PC |
|
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service- New York City Dept of Sanitation |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service- Department of Environmental Protection |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service- City of New York |
|
December 10, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |