Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
New York Marine And General Insurance Company, Park Developers & Builders, Inc., 59 Equities, Llc v. Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, Llc, Hr Steel, Inc.
On December 10, 2013 a tort case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 10, 2013
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Kings County Supreme Court
Category
Tort
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Case Duration
1 year, 9 months and 26 days
Overview
Causes of Action
present,SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: Oct 07, 2015COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: Jul 10, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: Dec 10, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service of Amended DJ Summons & Complaint on HR Steel, Inc. | |
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service of the Amended DJ Complaint on Preferred Contractors | |
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | |
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) | |
December 10, 2013 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT AND PART 130 CERTIFICATION | |
December 10, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |