Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Citimortgage, Inc. v. Mordechai Neustadt, Serach Neustadt, New York City Environmenal Control Board, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, John Doe Number One Through John Doe Number Ten
A Foreclosure (Residential Mortgage) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County. Judge Mark I. Partnow (Pt. 43) presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 06, 2013
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Judge
Hon. Mark I. Partnow (Pt. 43)
Category
Foreclosure (residential mortgage)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
7 months and 24 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jul 18, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Jul 18, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Jul 18, 2014ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 001)
Date: Jul 18, 2014REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: Feb 12, 2014ANSWER
Date: Jan 27, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 21, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 10, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 09, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Dec 24, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Dec 19, 2013SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Dec 06, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2014 | hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 43 Judge: Partnow, Hon. Mark I. |
|
August 27, 2014 | Motion |
Discontinue (Motion #001) Decided: 10/21/2014Granted Before Justice: Partnow, Hon. Mark I. Answer demanded: No Judge: Partnow, Hon. Mark I. |
|
August 07, 2014 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Partnow, Hon. Mark I. |
|
August 01, 2014 | hearing |
Settled - Loan Modification FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONF A Supreme Trial; CH NSF (Conversion) Judge: Partnow, Hon. Mark I. |
|
July 18, 2014 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 18, 2014 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT |
||
July 18, 2014 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE |
||
July 18, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AOS |
||
July 18, 2014 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) ORDER TO DISCONTINUE/CANCEL LP |
||
July 16, 2014 | hearing |
Continued Foreclosure Screening Sett PT Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Partnow, Hon. Mark I. |
|
May 05, 2014 | hearing |
Continued FORECLOSURE PRE-SETTLEMENT Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Partnow, Hon. Mark I. |
|
February 12, 2014 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
February 12, 2014 | Affidavit of Service of the Reply to Counterclaims | ||
January 27, 2014 |
ANSWER DEFTS |
||
January 27, 2014 |
NOTICE OF OPT-OUT BY DEFTS |
||
January 21, 2014 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION SHEET |
||
January 21, 2014 |
RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RJI |
||
January 10, 2014 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 10, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Delivery John Doe as John Doe |
||
January 10, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Delivery 1st Floor |
||
January 10, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Delivery Jane Doe as Jane Doe |
||
January 10, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Delivery Basement |
||
January 10, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Sovereign Bank |
||
January 10, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Mailing USA |
||
January 10, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Arturo Hernandez as John Doe |
||
January 10, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Gregorio Mendoza as John Doe |
||
January 10, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Luz Delgado as Jane Doe |
||
January 09, 2014 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 09, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Mailing Mordechai Neustadt |
||
January 09, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Mordechai Neustadt |
||
January 09, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Mailing Serach Neustadt |
||
January 09, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Serach Neustadt |
||
December 24, 2013 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 24, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Delivery 1st Floor |
||
December 24, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Delivery 2nd Floor |
||
December 24, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Delivery Luz Delgado as Jane Doe |
||
December 24, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Delivery Arturo Hernandez as John Doe |
||
December 24, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Delivery |
||
December 24, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Delivery Gregorio Mendoza as John Doe |
||
December 19, 2013 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 19, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS NYC Dept of Finance PVB |
||
December 19, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS NYC ECB |
||
December 06, 2013 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I CERT OF MERIT |
||
December 06, 2013 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H SAT OF MORTGAGE |
||
December 06, 2013 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G DEED |
||
December 06, 2013 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F JUDGMENT CREDITORS |
||
December 06, 2013 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E DEMAND LETTERS |
||
December 06, 2013 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D ASSIGNMENTS OF MORTGAGE |
||
December 06, 2013 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C LOAN MOD |
||
December 06, 2013 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE |
||
December 06, 2013 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE |
||
December 06, 2013 | CERTIFICATE OF MERIT | ||
December 06, 2013 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
December 06, 2013 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |