Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Hybrid Advance v. We Fix Dat Construction Llc Dba We Fix Dat Construction, Edwin Gerardo Andaluz
On March 09, 2022 a commercial - contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 09, 2022
Last Refreshed
June 15, 2024
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Supreme
Category
Commercial - Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Judgment (Other)
Overview
Causes of Action
1. BREACH OF CONTRACT
2. BREACH OF PERSONAL GUARANTEE
3. AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS (ATTORNEY’S FEES)
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings. The plaintiff, Hybrid Advance, is suing the defendants, We Fix Dat Construction LLC and Edwin Gerardo Andaluz, for breach of contract and bre…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT
Date: Jun 09, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: Jun 08, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: Jun 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jun 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 31, 2022SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Mar 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Mar 09, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on June 09, 2022 | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Affirmation of Non-Military Service | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Additional Mailing |
|
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service- All Defendants |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract |