Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Discover Bank v. Steven T Green
An Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, NY.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 29, 2021
Last Refreshed
July 22, 2023
Filing Location
Jefferson County, NY
Category
Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Consumer Debt
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT
Date: Mar 03, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: Mar 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 01, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Mar 01, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: Mar 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: Mar 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: Mar 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 1
Date: Mar 01, 2022ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: Jan 10, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Apr 29, 2021SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Apr 29, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 01, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment |
||
March 01, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215g |
||
March 01, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 01, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION Statute of Limitations |
||
March 01, 2022 | Affidavit of Facts | ||
March 01, 2022 | Affidavit of Military Investigation | ||
March 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Invoice |
||
January 10, 2022 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
May 24, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHO FORM |
||
May 24, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - STEVEN T GREEN |
||
April 29, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 29, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |